IL HB5569 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Workers' Compensation Act and the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Provides that a person employed as a firefighter, emergency medical technician (EMT), emergency medical technician-intermediate (EMT-I), advanced emergency medical technician (A-EMT), or paramedic may recover for post-traumatic stress disorder. Effective immediately.
Title
WRK COMP PTSD FIRST RESPONDER
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5569&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5569.htm |