IL HB5568 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that an art educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations may be issued to an applicant who has completed (i) a minimum of 60 semester hours of coursework from a regionally accredited institution of higher education or an accredited art school and (ii) a minimum of 2,000 hours of experience that is not education experience in each area to be taught by the applicant. Provides that an art educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations is valid until June 30 immediately following 5 years of the endorsement being issued and may be renewed if the applicant passes the test of basic skills required under the Code for Educator Licenses with Stipulations.
Title
SCH CD-ART EDU TEACH LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5568&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5568.htm |