IL HB5567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
Pending: House Appropriations-Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $12,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants to the Illinois YouthBuild Coalition. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DHS-YOUTHBUILD

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback