IL HB5564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that, with specified exceptions, if either party in the condemnation action demands a trial by jury, the condemning authority shall not be granted title or possession and the owner shall not be restrained from denying access to the property until the jury ascertains compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMINENT DOMAIN - TRIAL BY JURY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-10HouseTabled
2018-04-10HouseTabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000
2018-04-10HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7353010-5-5Amended CodeCitation Text
73557-101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback