IL HB5561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a public school student receiving a high school diploma shall have the right to wear a military uniform at the student's high school graduation ceremony if the student has completed basic training for and is an active member of a branch of the United States Armed Forces and is in good standing with his or her branch of the United States Armed Forces. Provides that a school's uniform or dress code policy shall comply with this provision.
Title
HIGH SCHOOL-MILITARY UNIFORM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.25b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 22-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |