IL HB5561 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a public school student receiving a high school diploma shall have the right to wear a military uniform at the student's high school graduation ceremony if the student has completed basic training for and is an active member of a branch of the United States Armed Forces and is in good standing with his or her branch of the United States Armed Forces. Provides that a school's uniform or dress code policy shall comply with this provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGH SCHOOL-MILITARY UNIFORM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed May 25, 2018
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018
2018-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-13SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-13HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.25bAmended CodeCitation Text
105522-28New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-2.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback