IL HB5559 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that the State Board of Education and Board of Higher Education shall establish text message hotlines to assist students and other persons in reporting any cases of sexual assault, grooming, or other violations that occurred within a school district or public institution of higher education or at a function of the school district or institution. Provides that the Boards shall adopt rules establishing the guidelines for the text message hotlines and providing for adequate support assistance to students and other persons who use the text message hotlines. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD/HIGHER ED-TEXT HOTLINE
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.192 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 205 | 9.41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5559&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5559.htm |