IL HB5558 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that the Department of Human Rights has the power to intervene in complaints pending before the Human Rights Commission regarding employment, financial credit, public accommodations, elementary, secondary, and higher education, or additional civil rights violations. Provides that the Department may petition and shall be permitted as a matter of right to intervene as a party in the proceeding if the Commission determines that: (i) the case involves matters of public interest or importance beyond the issues in the case; (ii) the Department has an interest different from one or more of the parties; (iii) the expertise of the Department makes it better suited to articulate a particular point of view; or (iv) the representation of the Department's interest by existing parties is or may be inadequate and the Department will or may be bound by an order or judgment in the action. Allows the Attorney General to seek to intervene on behalf of the Department in a civil action filed by a complainant in State or federal court if the Department certifies that the case is of general public importance. Makes conforming changes.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-DEPT INTERVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 10-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 10-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 10-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
775 | 5 | 7-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 8A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5558&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5558.htm |