IL HB5558 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that every facility shall also post conspicuously in public areas contact information for the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission and the agency designated by the Governor under the Protection and Advocacy for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act to administer a State plan to protect and advocate the rights of persons with developmental disabilities in accordance with the requirements of the federal Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDD CD-GUARD&ADV COMM-CONTACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 000-051-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Mental Health Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40552-200Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback