IL HB5553 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Blockchain Technology Act. Provides for the permitted uses of blockchain technology in transactions and proceedings. Provides limitations to the use of blockchain technology. Prohibits units of local government from implementing specified restrictions on the use of blockchain technology. Preempts home rule. Defines terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLOCKCHAIN TECHNOLOGY ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateDo Pass as Amended Telecommunications and Information Technology; 013-000-000
2018-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePostponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 010-000-000
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback