IL HB5551 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Sexually Transmissible Disease Control Act. Provides that a health care professional who makes a clinical diagnosis of trichomoniasis may prescribe, dispense, furnish, or otherwise provide prescription antibiotic drugs to the infected person's sexual partner or partners for the treatment of the sexually transmissible disease without physical examination of the partner or partners, if in the judgment of the health care professional the partner is unlikely or unable to present for comprehensive healthcare, including evaluation, testing, and treatment for sexually transmissible diseases.
Title
DISEASE-TRICHOMONIASIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 325 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5551&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5551.htm |