IL HB5551 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that for community-integrated living arrangements licensed under the Act, the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall provide the necessary fire inspection to comply with licensing requirements. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal may enter into an agreement with another State agency to conduct this inspection if qualified personnel are employed by that agency. Removes language providing that code enforcement inspection of the facility by the local authority may occur if the local authority having jurisdiction enforces code requirements that are equal to those enforced by the State Fire Marshal. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning fire inspections shall limit a local authority with jurisdiction from conducting local code inspection and enforcement or (rather than shall prohibit a local fire authority) from conducting fire incident planning activities. Effective immediately.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0593 |
2018-06-22 | House | Effective Date June 22, 2018 |
2018-06-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-26 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |