IL HB5551 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that for community-integrated living arrangements licensed under the Act, the Office of the State Fire Marshal shall provide the necessary fire inspection to comply with licensing requirements. Provides that the Office of the State Fire Marshal may enter into an agreement with another State agency to conduct this inspection if qualified personnel are employed by that agency. Removes language providing that code enforcement inspection of the facility by the local authority may occur if the local authority having jurisdiction enforces code requirements that are equal to those enforced by the State Fire Marshal. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning fire inspections shall limit a local authority with jurisdiction from conducting local code inspection and enforcement or (rather than shall prohibit a local fire authority) from conducting fire incident planning activities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-03SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21013513Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback