IL HB5547 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0914
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois State Auditing Act. Provides that on a biennial basis, the Auditor General shall conduct a performance audit of State agencies and their cybersecurity programs and practices, with a particular focus on agencies holding large volumes of personal information. Provides for the subjects to be assessed by the audit. Provides for the issuance of an audit report.
Title
AUDITOR GENL-CYBERSECURITY
Sponsors
Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0914 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |