IL HB5543 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Gives non-home rule municipalities with a population of more than 2,000 the power to exercise all power provided to home rule units under Section 6 of Article VII of the Illinois Constitution, except for the powers to tax, to impose fees, and to incur debt. Provides that a home rule municipal retailer's occupation tax may be imposed up to a 1% increment if the corporate authorities of a home rule municipality by ordinance or resolution call for the submission to the electors of the municipality the question of whether the municipality shall impose such a tax or increase the rate of such a tax (rather than only shall be imposed in 1/4% increments). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-POWERS/HOME RULE REVENUE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 1-1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5543&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5543.htm |