IL HB5542 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that no tax is imposed under the Acts upon the use or purchase of energy-efficient products that qualify as "Energy Star" products under the federal Energy Star Program and that are purchased at a price of $1,500 or less during a tax holiday. Defines "tax-holiday" as the periods each year: (1) beginning at 12:01 a.m. on November 1st and continuing through 11:59 p.m. on November 7th; and (2) beginning at 12:01 a.m. on April 22nd and continuing through 11:59 p.m. on April 28th. Sets forth criteria for transactions to qualify for the exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC-HOLIDAY-ENERGY STAR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5542&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5542.htm |