IL HB5540 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0642
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the First 2016 General Revisory Act. Combines multiple versions of Sections amended by more than one Public Act. Renumbers Sections of various Acts to eliminate duplication. Corrects obsolete cross-references and technical errors. Makes stylistic changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRST 2016 GENERAL REVISORY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0642 |
2016-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2016 |
2016-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |