IL HB5540 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0961
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Agriculture administration building location at 801 E. Sangamon Avenue, Springfield, Illinois at the State Fairgrounds shall be known as the John R. Block Building. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE FAIRGROUND-BUILDING NAME
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Raymond Poe [R] | Rep. Rich Brauer [R] |
Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Sen. Darin LaHood [R] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0961 |
2012-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2012 |
2012-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-002 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |