IL HB5540 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. In provisions authorizing the corporate authorities of a municipality to borrow money from any bank or other financial institution, adds to the definition of "financial institution" any regional planning commission or joint regional planning commission established in accordance with the Counties Code. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CODE-BORROWING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1047 | |
2010-07-14 | Effective Date July 14, 2010 | |
2010-07-14 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Local Government; 005-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-002-001 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-02 | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |