IL HB5539 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, by June 30, 2022, to select from the Prioritization of the Urgency of Need of Services (PUNS) database no fewer than 3,600 persons with intellectual or developmental disabilities to receive relevant State services and supports. Provides that no fewer than 600 persons shall be selected to receive services by June 30, 2019 and the numbers of persons selected shall increase each year thereafter until the list of persons in the PUNS is exhausted. Requires the Department to pursue all federal funding options for intellectual and developmental services and supports including applying for a demonstration waiver and a State Plan amendment to expand and increase the availability of services to persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities. Requires federal funding obtained under a demonstration waiver to be directed towards increasing the availability of permanent supportive housing and other community-integrated living arrangements. Requires federal funding obtained as a result of federal approval of a Medicaid State Plan amendment to fund a Illinois Children and Adult Home and Community-Based Services Pilot Program to expand and increase community-based services and housing options for adults and children eligible for services under the Department's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver programs. Provides that subject to federal approval, the availability of housing options and support services provided under a demonstration waiver or Medicaid State Plan amendment shall be fully implemented by June 30, 2022. Contains provisions on reporting requirements and other matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-HOUSING/SUPPORT SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170576New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback