IL HB5538 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to create a program to select people listed on the Department's Prioritization of the Urgency of Need of Services (PUNS) database to receive housing and community-based support services. Provides that by June 30, 2022, no less than 50% of the persons selected from the PUNS database shall qualify for or receive community-based support services under the State's Home and Community-Based Services Waiver for Persons with Developmental Disabilities (State's Waiver Program); and no less than 50% of the persons selected from the PUNS database shall qualify for or receive both housing and community-based support services funded by the Department. Provides that by June 30, 2022, the Department shall fully eliminate the 8-person community-integrated living arrangements model as a housing option for persons eligible for services under the State's Waiver program and shall instead implement a flexible housing model, as defined by the Department by rule, that utilizes a needs-based sliding scale to determine a person's eligibility and placement for housing. Contains provisions concerning reporting requirements. Provides that implementation of the provisions shall be contingent on the receipt of all necessary federal approvals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-HOUSING&SUPPORT SERVICES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170576New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback