IL HB5537 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0602
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Removes language requiring the Department of Human Services to adopt a State plan for the distribution of community-integrated living arrangements throughout the State and makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-13HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0602
2018-07-13HouseEffective Date July 13, 2018
2018-07-13HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sheri Jesiel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21013510Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback