IL HB5536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board may, in collaboration with community colleges, furnish information for State and federal accountability purposes, promote student and institutional improvement, and meet research needs. Provides that the Board may review and approve or disapprove (rather than participate in and recommend approval or disapproval of) any contract or agreement that community colleges enter into with any organization, association, educational institution, or government agency to provide educational services and may monitor the performance under any contract. Requires the board of trustees of each community college district to file a written or electronic copy of its annual budget with the Board. Provides that any graduate from a recognized high school or student otherwise qualified to attend a public community college and residing outside a community college district may attend any recognized public community college in this State at the tuition rate of a student residing in the district; requires the Board to pay the community college the difference between the in-district and out-of-district tuition amounts. Provides that, for tuition purposes, a student shall be classified as a resident of a community college district after establishing the 30-day residency requirement of the district. Repeals provisions governing indemnification, deferred maintenance grants, the College and Career Readiness Pilot Program, a directory of graduating vocational and technical school students, and other items. Makes other changes. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COMMUNITY COLLEGE ACT-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1108051-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-11Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-11.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108052-12Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-12.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-15Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-16.02Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-16.03Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108052-20Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108052-24Amended CodeCitation Text
1108052-25Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108052-6.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-12Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-12.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-12.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-14.2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-14.3Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-20.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-20.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-22.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-22.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-25.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-26.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-29Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-31.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-40Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-40.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-42.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-46.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108053-48Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-53Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1108053-7, subsec. cAmended CodeCitation Text
1108053-7aAmended CodeCitation Text
1108053-7bRepealed CodeCitation Text
1108055-3Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055-4Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055-6Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055-7Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055-8Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108055A-15Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055A-25Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055A-35Amended CodeCitation Text
1108055A-45Amended CodeCitation Text
1108056-1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108056-2Amended CodeCitation Text
1108056-4.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1108056-4.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1108056-6.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
1108057-25Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-26Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-5Amended CodeCitation Text
1108057-9Amended CodeCitation Text
301055.325Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback