IL HB5531 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides a $5 discount for vehicles of the first divisions and Class B vehicles of the second division if the registration payment is made online. Restricts the Secretary of State from charging an additional fee for registration fee payments made by a credit card, debit card, or other electronic means for persons renewing their vehicle registration online.
Title
VEH CD-REDUCE REGISTRATION FEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Caulkins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-806 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-835 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5531&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5531.htm |