IL HB5531 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching System for Fair Elections Act. Amends the Election Code. Creates a small donor campaign contribution matching system for candidates for various offices of State government. Creates the Small Donor Democracy Matching Fund as a special Fund in the State Treasury. Sets forth requirements for accessing the small donor matching system. Sets forth provisions for the funding of the matching contributions. Imposes limits on the access to matching funds. Provides for penalties for violations of the provisions. Sets forth disclosure requirements. Creates the Campaign Finance Board within the State Board of Elections to implement the campaign matching system. Provides that provisions of the Code concerning election interference do not apply to the campaign contribution matching program or similar systems of public financing for elections established by a home rule unit of government. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change. Defines terms. Includes legislative findings and severability provisions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-CONTRIBUTION MATCHING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059-25.1Amended CodeCitation Text
1059A-10New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-15New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-20New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-25New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-30New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-35New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-40New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-45New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-5New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-50New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-55New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-60New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-65New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-70New CodeSee Bill Text
1059A-75New CodeSee Bill Text
105Art. 9A headingNew CodeSee Bill Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback