IL HB5526 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Provides that when a contract for services is to be awarded, a political subdivision shall give preference to a resident firm against a non-resident firm, when the non-resident firm is from a state that gives or requires a preference to firms from that state. Sets forth requirements concerning the weight of the preference. Defines "resident firm". Provides that the preference for resident firms does not apply to any contract for any project where federal funds are available when its provisions may be in conflict with federal law or regulation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCGOV-RESIDENT FIRMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-03-09HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2012-02-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-15HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
505105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback