IL HB5522 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes it unlawful to deliver, sell, or purchase or cause to be delivered, sold, or purchased or cause to be possessed by another, an assault weapon, assault weapon attachment, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge. Makes it unlawful for any person to knowingly possess an assault weapon, .50 caliber rifle, or .50 caliber cartridge 300 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, except possession of weapons registered with the Illinois State Police in the time provided. Provides exemptions and penalties. Prohibits delivery, sale, purchase or possession of large capacity ammunition feeding devices. Provides exemptions and penalties.
Title
CRIM CD-ASSAULT WEAPONS BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-07-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-07-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-07-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-07-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-07-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-07-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-07-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 24-1.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5522&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5522.htm |