IL HB5522 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Nurse Practice Act, and the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Provides that the rules adopted by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation concerning continuing education shall require that, on and after January 1, 2022, all continuing education courses for persons licensed under the Acts contain curriculum that includes the understanding of implicit bias in the practice of medicine. Provides that a continuing education course dedicated solely to research or other issues that does not include a direct patient care component is not required to contain curriculum that includes implicit bias in the practice of medicine. Specifies requirements that continuing education courses must satisfy. Effectively immediately.
Title
MEDICAL IMPLICIT BIAS TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-21 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 55-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 65-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 11.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5522&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5522.htm |