IL HB5521 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a deduction for the full amount of union dues paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year if the taxpayer was not allowed a federal deduction under the Internal Revenue Code. Provides that, if any amount of union dues representing federal miscellaneous itemized deductions was allowed as a federal deduction, then the amount allowed as an Illinois deduction shall be a percentage of the union dues disallowed under the Internal Revenue Code. Provides that the deduction is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-UNION DUES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-12HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback