IL HB5520 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Departments of State Government Law. Provides that expedited temporary occupational or professional licenses issued to service members and the spouses of service members meeting specified requirements shall be valid for 3 years (currently, valid 6 months) after the date of issuance or until a license is granted or a notice to deny a license is issued in accordance with rules adopted by the department issuing the license, whichever occurs first. Provides that the required fee paid in the application process for an expedited temporary occupational or professional license issued to service members and the spouses of service members shall be refundable (currently, not refundable).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SERVICE MEMBER-EXPEDITED LIC

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback