IL HB5519 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Defines terms. Provides that, with exceptions, a landlord shall not require disclosure of, disclose, intimidate, harass, or evict a tenant on the basis of a person's immigration or citizenship status. Provides that an oral or written warning notice or explanation, given in good faith, regarding the applicable rental agreement, rules, regulations, lease, or law is not a violation of the Act. Provides that the Act does not enlarge or diminish a landlord's right to terminate a tenancy pursuant to existing State or local law; nor does the Act enlarge or diminish any ability of local government to regulate or enforce a prohibition against a landlord's harassment of a tenant. Provides that waiver of a right under the Act by a tenant, occupant, or person known to the landlord to be associated with a tenant or occupant is void as a matter of public policy. Provides remedies. Provides that an action for injunctive relief may be brought by a nonprofit organization. Provides that in a civil action involving a tenant's or occupant's housing rights, no inquiry shall be permitted into the tenant's or occupant's immigration or citizenship status, with exceptions. Contains a severability clause. Amends the Eviction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that it is an affirmative defense to an eviction that a landlord engaged in conduct prohibited under the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Amends the Mobile Home Landlord and Tenant Rights Act. Provides that an eviction order may not be entered against a tenant as a reprisal for a tenant's efforts to secure remedies under the Immigrant Tenant Protection Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IMMIGRANT TENANT PROTECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-004-000
2018-04-10HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73559-106.3New CodeSee Bill Text
76574516Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback