IL HB5516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for any employer, employment agency, labor organization, or public employer to refuse to hire, to segregate, or to act with respect to recruitment, hiring or selection for training or apprenticeship on the basis of a prospective employee's status as unemployed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISCRIM AGAINST UNEMPLOYED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-23HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-05-23HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-23HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-003-000; -FAILED
2018-05-14HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77552-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback