IL HB5513 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2019 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game to benefit State police memorials. Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Criminal Justice Information Projects Fund and provides that any interest earned on moneys in that Fund must be deposited in that Fund. Provides that moneys received from the scratch-off game shall be divided equally for distribution into the Chicago Police Memorial Foundation Fund, the Police Memorial Committee Fund, and the Illinois State Police Memorial Fund and shall be used to fund grants for building and maintaining memorials and parks; holding annual memorial commemorations; giving scholarships to children of officers killed or catastrophically injured in the line of duty, or those interested in pursuing a career in law enforcement; providing financial assistance to police officers and their families when a police officer is killed or injured in the line of duty; and providing financial assistance to officers for the purchase or replacement of bullet proof vests to be used in the line of duty. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Defines "net revenue". Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-SCRATCH-OFF-POLICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0647 |
2018-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2018 |
2018-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3930 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |