IL HB5511 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Provides that a designated certified person may be trained by the fire pump equipment manufacturer and deemed to be a fire pump manufacturer's authorized representative. Provides that an individual who performs inspection and testing duties may be certified by a nationally recognized fire pump manufacturer. Defines "fire pump manufacturer's authorized representative". Makes other changes. Effective immediately. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE PUMP MANUFACTURERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 317 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 317 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5511&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5511.htm |