IL HB5507 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a school shall notify the parent or guardian of a student who threatens to commit suicide and notify the parent or guardian of a student who searches the Internet, using an electronic device provided by the school, for information or terms related to suicide. Requires a school to maintain a record of the notice to the parent or guardian. Provides that at the request of a parent or guardian, a school may provide information and make recommendations related to an incident or threat. Provides that the school shall inform the parent of the availability of social work services, counseling, and other interventions and shall provide those services at the request of the parent or guardian. Provides for expungement of the record.
Title
SCH CD-SUICIDAL THREAT-NOTIFY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5507&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5507.htm |