IL HB5506 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that by January 1, 2019 (rather than May 1, 2011), and quarterly thereafter, the Department of Public Health shall generate and publish quarterly a list of distressed facilities. Provides that criteria for inclusion of certified facilities on the list shall be those used by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for its Special Focus Facility List (rather than U.S. General Accounting Office in report 9-689, until such time as the Department by rule modifies the criteria). Provides that there shall be no more than 10 distressed facilities at any one time using the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services Special Focus Facilities criteria. Provides that the Department shall, by rule, adopt criteria to identify non-Medicaid-certified facilities that are distressed and shall publish this list quarterly beginning October 1, 2019 (rather than October 1, 2011). Provides that the Department may (rather than if the distressed facility does not seek the assistance of an independent consultant, the Department shall) place a monitor in (rather than place a monitor or a temporary manager in) the facility, depending on the Department's assessment of the condition of the facility. Provides that a distressed facility shall develop (rather than may contract with an independent consultant to develop and assist in the implementation of) a plan of improvement to bring and keep the facility in compliance with the Act and, if applicable, with federal certification requirements. Provides that by February 1, 2020 (rather than February 1, 2011), the Department of Public Health shall make a specified report to the General Assembly. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NURS HOME-DISTRESSED FACILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210453-304.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback