IL HB5504 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Capital Development Board Act. Requires the Department of Transportation and the Capital Development Board to develop policies regarding maximum acceptable global warming potential for specified eligible materials used in public projects. Provides for review and adjustment of the respective policies. Provides requirements for contractors awarded public project contracts. Requires the Department and the Board to strive to achieve a continuous reduction of greenhouse gas emissions over time. Provides for annual reporting requirements by the Department and the Board. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
GOVT-PUBLIC PROJECTS MATERIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-620 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3105 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5504&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5504.htm |