IL HB5502 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-002
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Real Estate Appraiser Licensing Act of 2002. Removes language providing that an associate real estate trainee appraiser license may not be renewed more than 2 times and language providing that an applicant for an associate real estate trainee appraiser license shall personally take and pass an examination authorized by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REAL ESTATE TRAINEE APPRAISER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-002
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2254585-20Amended CodeCitation Text
2254585-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback