IL HB5500 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that reimbursement rates, including enhanced payment rates and rate add-ons, for psychiatric and behavioral health services provided in or by community mental health centers licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services shall not be lower than the rates for such services in effect on November 1, 2017. Provides that implementation of the reimbursement rates shall be contingent on federal approval.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-RATES-MENTAL HEALTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-5.05aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback