IL HB5500 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that reimbursement rates, including enhanced payment rates and rate add-ons, for psychiatric and behavioral health services provided in or by community mental health centers licensed or certified by the Department of Human Services shall not be lower than the rates for such services in effect on November 1, 2017. Provides that implementation of the reimbursement rates shall be contingent on federal approval.
Title
MEDICAID-RATES-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5500&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5500.htm |