IL HB5498 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Creates the Deferred Retirement Option Article. Provides a deferred retirement option plan (DROP) for certain participants under the Downstate Teacher Article who are eligible to retire and meet other criteria. Provides that a participant in the DROP may elect to participate for up to 5 years. Provides that on the effective date of the member's election, the System shall credit the member's account on a monthly basis, for as long as the member participates in the DROP, an amount equal to the monthly amount of retirement annuity the member would otherwise be eligible to receive had the member retired on the date of the election. Provides that the DROP member shall be considered in active service for purposes of participation in a collective bargaining agreement, for health care benefits, and for other purposes. Establishes a DROP administered by the State Treasurer for pension funds or retirement systems that are required to establish a DROP and elect to transfer administrative responsibility for the DROP to the State Treasurer. Sets forth provisions concerning interest on the account; termination of the DROP; contributions; administrative costs; and a DROP advisory board. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-DEFERRED RETIRE OPTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-05HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2024-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-09HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40516-207New CodeSee Bill Text
40525-10New CodeSee Bill Text
40525-5New CodeSee Bill Text
405Art. 25 headingNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback