IL HB5498 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that within 300 calendar days (instead of 180 days) after the date that a civil rights violation, other than a violation concerning a real estate transaction, allegedly has been committed, a charge in writing under oath or affirmation may be filed with the Department of Human Rights by an aggrieved party or issued by the Department itself under the signature of the Director of Human Rights. Provides that if a charge is filed with the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) within 300 calendar days (instead of 180 days) after the date of the alleged civil rights violation, the charge shall be deemed filed with the Department on the date filed with the EEOC. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN RIGHTS-CHARGE PROCEDURES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-000-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77557A-102Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback