IL HB5497 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0778
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0778
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Provides that a credit union may furnish the financial records of a member to an appropriate law enforcement authority upon written request from the law enforcement authority explaining a reasonable suspicion of an imminent threat to the personal security and safety of a member exists. Provides that a supervisory committee of a credit union with assets of $10,000,000 or more shall engage a certified public accountant or certified public accounting firm licensed by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to perform an annual external independent audit. Provides that a supervisory committee of a credit union with assets of $5,000,000 or more but less than $10,000,000 shall engage a certified public accountant or certified public accounting firm licensed by the Department to perform an annual external independent audit or an agreed-upon procedures report. Provides that the external independent audit report or agreed upon procedures report shall be delivered to the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation no later than 120 days after the end of the calendar or fiscal year. Provides that funds not used in loans to the credit union's members may be invested to aid in the credit union's management or in the purchase and assumption of assets held by other financial institutions. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CREDIT UNION-AUDIT/EMAIL
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0778 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-024-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 305 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |