IL HB5494 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0692
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that a trafficking victim as defined by the Criminal Code of 2012 shall be eligible to petition for the immediate sealing of his or her criminal record upon the completion of his or her last sentence if his or her participation in the underlying offense was a direct result of human trafficking under the Criminal Code of 2012 or a severe form of trafficking under the federal Trafficking Victims Protection Act. Provides that a petitioner under this provision, in addition to other requirements provided by law, shall include in his or her petition a clear and concise statement that: (1) he or she was a victim of human trafficking at the time of the offense; and (2) that his or her participation in the offense was a direct result of human trafficking under the Criminal Code of 2012 or a severe form of trafficking under the federal Trafficking Victims Protection Act. Provides that if an objection is filed alleging that the petitioner is not entitled to immediate sealing, the court shall conduct a hearing and the court shall determine whether the petitioner is entitled to immediate sealing under the provision. Effective immediately.
Title
SEALING-TRAFFICKING VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0692 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-001 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |