IL HB5490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a chief of police who has voluntarily entered into an irrevocable agreement with a municipality to not participate in that municipality's pension fund is not eligible to participate in that municipality's pension fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENCD-DNST POL-CHIEF OF POLICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4053-109Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback