IL HB5490 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a chief of police who has voluntarily entered into an irrevocable agreement with a municipality to not participate in that municipality's pension fund is not eligible to participate in that municipality's pension fund. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-DNST POL-CHIEF OF POLICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 3-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |