IL HB5484 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a summons issued in an action to collect a debt shall include a separate notice containing specified language regarding debtor rights. Provides that the clerk of the court shall cause the notice to be posted in courtrooms or in the hallway in front of courtrooms and be available for distribution in all courtrooms hearing cases involving debt collection matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIV PRO-DEBTOR PROTECTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-23HouseTo Civil Procedure Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-08HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73552-201.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback