IL HB5482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall allow an applicant to provide his or her individual taxpayer identification number as an alternative to provide a social security number when applying for a license. Provides that no applicant shall be denied a license solely based on his or her immigration status or citizenship status. Makes conforming changes in the School Code, Pharmacy Practice Act, and the Attorney Act. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DFPR LICENSURE-IMMIGRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-003-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-140New CodeSee Bill Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text
225856Amended CodeCitation Text
7052052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback