IL HB5481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than day 60 of instruction in each school year, a school board shall report to the State Board of Education for kindergarten through grade 12 classes certain information about actively employed teachers, pupil-teacher ratios, class instructors, and class sections; defines terms. Requires the State Board of Education to publish the information contained in the reports on its Internet website no later than December 1, 2019 and annually thereafter. Sets forth class size goals to be achieved by the 2020-2021 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-CLASS SIZE GOALS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-19HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-014-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 007-004-000
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-045-001
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-002-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.67New CodeSee Bill Text
10552-3.136aNew CodeSee Bill Text
105534-18.60New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback