IL HB5477 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides that, as part of its annual renewal application, an animal shelter or animal control facility must report to the Department of Agriculture specific information concerning dogs and cats received from another state or country and specific information concerning disposition and manner of transfer of all dogs and cats that leave its facilities. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMAL SHELTER-TRANSFER REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-19HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-02HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2256057Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback